This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/15/2023 at 01:16:09 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF ALFRED J REMBERT, et al Vs. FI BAY POINTE LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 THE ESTATE OF ALFRED J REMBERT, filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against FI BAY POINTE LLC,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REMBERT, MATTIE M, INDIVIDUALLY

THE ESTATE OF ALFRED J REMBERT BY AND THROUGH REMBERT, MATTIE M, PERSONAL REP

Defendants

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

FI BAY POINTE LLC

FITZPATRICK, CYNTHIA ANN AS TO BAY POINTE NURSING PAVILION

KANNON HEALTH SERVICES LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS KANNON HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAINEY C BOOTH JR, ESQ

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

05/03/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

COMPLAINT

04/29/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/03/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/03/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/03/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

04/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/03/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/03/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

09/22/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

08/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/01/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/01/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/25/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/27/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/23/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/23/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

06/23/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 24; (ARBITRATION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 25; (ARBITRATION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 26; (ARBITRATION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 21; (ARBITRATION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 22; (ARBITRATION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 23; (ARBITRATION) W/ATTACHED EXHIBIT A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 18; (ARBITRATION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 19; (ARBITRATION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party:; FI BAY POINTE LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party:; KANNON HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 5; Party:; AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 6; Party:; BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 7; Party:; FITZPATRICK, CYNTHIA ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 8; Party:; REMBERT, MATTIE M, INDIVIDUALLY; Party:; THE ESTATE OF ALFRED J REMBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; THE ESTATE OF ALFRED J REMBERT; Total Financial Assessment; 500.00; Total Payments and Credits; 500.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-15253; REMBERT, MATTIE M; (450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; THE ESTATE OF ALFRED J REMBERT; Total Financial Assessment; 500.00; Total Payments and Credits; 500.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; w/ EXHIBIT A - LETTERS OF ADMINSTRATION ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less