This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 09/06/2022 at 08:06:56 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF ALCUS E BROXSON Vs. KINDRED HOSPITALS EAST LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 THE ESTATE OF ALCUS E BROXSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KINDRED HOSPITALS EAST LLC. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE ESTATE OF ALCUS E BROXSON BY AND THROUGH BROXSON, ERICH J, PERSONAL REP

St. Petersburg, FL 33713

Defendants

KINDRED HEALTHCARE LLC AS TO KINDRED HOSPITAL BAY AREA ST PETERSBURG

1209 Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC

1209 Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

KINDRED HOSPITALS EAST LLC

1200 South Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARY J PERRY

Attorney at WILES & ASSOCIATES P B F/K/A WILKES & MCHUGH PA

Po Box 1169

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Defendant Attorney

RICHARD M SEBEK, ESQ

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS-ISSUED

07/11/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

07/08/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

07/08/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

EXHIBIT

07/08/2022: EXHIBIT

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

07/08/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

SUMMONS-ISSUED

07/11/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS-ISSUED

07/11/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/22/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/15/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/22/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 10; TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 8; Party: KINDRED HEALTHCARE LLC; Party: KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC; Party: KINDRED HOSPITALS EAST LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; THE ESTATE OF ALCUS E BROXSON; Total Financial Assessment; 430.00; Total Payments and Credits; 430.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-24634; THE ESTATE OF ALCUS E BROXSON; (430.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; THE ESTATE OF ALCUS E BROXSON; Total Financial Assessment; 430.00; Total Payments and Credits; 430.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 5; Party: KINDRED HEALTHCARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 6; Party: KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 7; Party: KINDRED HOSPITALS EAST LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A-LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE is a litigant

Latest cases where Kindred Hospitals East, Llc Dba Kindred Hospitals Of North Florida is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Perry, Mary J, ESQ.