This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/24/2021 at 07:03:02 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON Vs. JOHN T JARZYK, et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOHN T JARZYK. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

2807 Edgewater Drive

Orlando, FL 32804

Defendants

BERMUDA BAY BEACH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

490 1St Ave S Suite 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

JARZYK, JANET M

St Petersburg, FL 33711

JARZYK, JOHN T

St Petersburg, FL 33711

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JANET M JARZYK

St Peterburg, FL 33711

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN T JARZYK

St Peterburg, FL 33711

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

St Petersburg, FL 33711

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

St Petersburg, FL 33711

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D VAMVAS, ESQ

Attorney at LENDER LEGAL PLLC

2807 Edgewater Dr

Orlando, FL 32804

Defendant Attorney

KAREN E MALLER, ESQ

Attorney at JOHNSON POPE BOKOR

490 1St Ave S Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

12/16/2021: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

12/07/2021: SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

12/07/2021: SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

12/07/2021: SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

12/07/2021: SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/07/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/07/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/07/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/07/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 27; Party: BERMUDA BAY BEACH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING; Doc # 26; WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JANET M JARZYK; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN T JARZYK; Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 1; Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 18; 12032021; Party: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 19; 12072021; Party: JARZYK, JOHN T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 20; 12072021; Party: JARZYK, JANET M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 21; 12062021; Party: BERMUDA BAY BEACH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED; Doc # 22; Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED; Doc # 23; Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED; Doc # 24; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN T JARZYK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED; Doc # 25; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JANET M JARZYK

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET; Doc # 8; FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketFORM B - NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 10; Party: JARZYK, JOHN T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 11; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN T JARZYK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 12; Party: JARZYK, JANET M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 13; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JANET M JARZYK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 14; Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 15; Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 16; Party: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 17; Party: BERMUDA BAY BEACH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERMUDA BEACH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAMVAS, ANTHONY D