This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 09/08/2020 at 08:13:38 (UTC).

TERESA COMBS Vs. MICHELLE GRAHAM, MACK GRAHAM

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 TERESA COMBS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MICHELLE GRAHAM, MACK GRAHAM. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-CO

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMBS, TERESA

Largo, FL 33774

Defendants

GRAHAM, MACK

Clearwater, FL 33756

GRAHAM, MICHELLE

Clearwater, FL 33756

 

Court Documents

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

07/21/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

RESPONSE

07/21/2020: RESPONSE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

07/21/2020: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

07/21/2020: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

ANSWER

07/17/2020: ANSWER

MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

07/21/2020: MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

SUMMONS - SERVED

07/13/2020: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

07/13/2020: SUMMONS - SERVED

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

07/13/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

07/10/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

07/10/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

LEASE

07/10/2020: LEASE

THREE DAY NOTICE

07/10/2020: THREE DAY NOTICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT; Doc # 11; Party: GRAHAM, MACK; Party: GRAHAM, MICHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 12; NONMILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 13; NONMILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 14; TO ANSWER OF MICHELLE GRAHAM W/ATTACHMENTS (UNSIGNED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 15; (DEFAULT) COUNT I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketANSWER; Doc # 10; Party: GRAHAM, MICHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 7; Party: GRAHAM, MACK; Party: GRAHAM, MICHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 8; 07102020; Party: GRAHAM, MICHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 9; 07102020; Party: GRAHAM, MACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; COMBS, TERESA; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-14403; COMBS, TERESA; (205.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; COMBS, TERESA; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; COMBS, TERESA; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - II COUNTS; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 2; 1975.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketLEASE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 5; Party: GRAHAM, MICHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 6; Party: GRAHAM, MACK

    Read MoreRead Less