This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/26/2019 at 08:06:33 (UTC).

TD BANK USA NA Vs. VIRGINIA T LUBIN

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 TD BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VIRGINIA T LUBIN. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA NA

6413 Congress Avenue Suite 150

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

LUBIN, VIRGINIA T

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLYNN LAVRAR, ESQ

Attorney at RAS LaVRAR LLC

1133 S University Dr 2Nd Fl

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING

02/22/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

02/22/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

CERTIFICATE

02/22/2019: CERTIFICATE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

02/22/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

01/16/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

01/29/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/28/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE

12/28/2018: NOTICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

12/28/2018: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

12/28/2018: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/28/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 11; WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • CERTIFICATE; Doc # 12; OF TAXABLE COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 13; FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 14; ATTACHED SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF; Doc # 10; AFFDS IN PROOF OF CLAIM, COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • NOTICE RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 6; Party: LUBIN, VIRGINIA T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 8; Party: LUBIN, VIRGINIA T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 2; SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • NOTICE; Doc # 4; DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; TD BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2018-47086; TD BANK USA NA; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; TD BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less