This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 10/08/2021 at 07:08:52 (UTC).

TD BANK USA NA Vs. TABITHA L GENTILE

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 TD BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TABITHA L GENTILE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA NA

C/O Drew Linen Esq 1133 S University Dr 2Nd Fl

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant

GENTILE, TABITHA L

Pinellas Park, FL 33781

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DREW LINEN

Attorney at RAS LaVRAR LLC

1133 South University Drive Second Floor

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom330070119

09/21/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE

09/15/2021: NOTICE

COMPLAINT

09/15/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

09/17/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TD BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-22244; TD BANK USA NA; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TD BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 4; OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 5; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant