This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2019 at 08:13:13 (UTC).

TD BANK USA N A Vs. MELISSA L STEENBURG

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 TD BANK USA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MELISSA L STEENBURG. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA N A

6413 Congress Avenue Suite 150

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendants

POUND, MELISSA L

Largo, FL 33778

STEENBURG, MELISSA L

Largo, FL 33778

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLYNN LAVRAR, ESQ

Attorney at RAS LaVRAR LLC

1133 S University Dr 2Nd Fl

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

01/23/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

NOTICE OF FILING

01/23/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

CERTIFICATE

01/23/2019: CERTIFICATE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

01/23/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

ORDER

01/23/2019: ORDER

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

12/12/2018: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE

11/30/2018: NOTICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

11/30/2018: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

11/30/2018: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/30/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

No Description Available

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

01/08/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • ORDER; Doc # 12; AMENDED INSTANTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 13; WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • CERTIFICATE; Doc # 14; OF TAXABLE COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 15; ATTACHED SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 16; FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • ORDER; Doc # 10; AMENDING DEFENDANT INSTANTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PENDING RE; Doc # 11; JDMT - ATTY TO SUBMIT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • NOTICE RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 6; Party: POUND, MELISSA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 8; Party: POUND, MELISSA L; Party: TD BANK USA N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 2; ACCOUNT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • NOTICE; Doc # 4; OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; TD BANK USA N A; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2018-43868; TD BANK USA N A; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; TD BANK USA N A; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less