This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/13/2021 at 01:14:10 (UTC).

TANYA J FABIAN vs. JASON J FABIAN

Case Summary

On 06/27/2011 TANYA J FABIAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JASON J FABIAN. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PIERCE, JAMES. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-FD

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PIERCE, JAMES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FABIAN, TANYA J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2012
  • DocketMASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Party: FABIAN, JASON J; Vol./Book 17761, Page 1237, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Comment: NOTICE-LACK OF PROS MLD TO PLTF/PLTF ATTY; VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO; Comment: FABIAN JASON J; VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO; Comment: NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 080612-MLD AS TO: VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED; Comment: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED JASON J FABIAN; VER: F; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • DocketJudgment Record/Report - Fee Paid $; Comment: JUDGMENT RECORD/REPORT FEE PAID $10.50; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • DocketSummons - Fee Paid $; Comment: SUMMONS FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Comment: SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • DocketPETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FINANCIAL STATEMENT/AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY; Comment: AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN; Comment: PARENTING PLAN SAFETY FOCUSED; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION WITH MINOR CHILDREN; Comment: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION W/MINOR CHILDREN; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION U02 FROM SECTION 023 BY 0168 - MANUAL C; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 023 BY 0168 - RANDOM FD; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less