Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/08/2021 at 14:20:28 (UTC).

SYNOVUS BANK Vs. MK KITCHENS LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 SYNOVUS BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MK KITCHENS LLC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNOVUS BANK

4100-3 Southpoint, Drive E

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendants

KESKIN, SERKAN

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33304

KESKIN, MARSIDA

Largo, FL 33773

MK KITCHENS LLC

2210 4Th Street, North

Saint Petersburg, FL 33704

MK KITCHENS LLC A FLORIDA LLC

2210 4Th Street, North

Saint Petersburg, FL 33704

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CATHARINE D HANLEY, ESQ

Attorney at HIDAY & RICKE PA

Post Office Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

03/03/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

02/26/2020: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

12/04/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/04/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

10/28/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

AFFIDAVIT

10/28/2019: AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

10/28/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

10/11/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

09/19/2019: SUMMONS - SERVED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

08/28/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/28/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

08/05/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

06/19/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

COMPLAINT

06/19/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/19/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSUBPOENA - SERVED; Doc # 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 30; SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES; Doc # 29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 25; PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED BY COUERT 02242020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 27; Vol./Book 20902, Page 2099, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 23; 021820 2:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 24; FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 16; Party: SYNOVUS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 072419; Party: MK KITCHENS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 8; 072419; Party: KESKIN, MARSIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SYNOVUS BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 430.00; Total Payments and Credits; 430.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-23075; SYNOVUS BANK; (430.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SYNOVUS BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 430.00; Total Payments and Credits; 430.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: MK KITCHENS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: KESKIN, MARSIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: KESKIN, SERKAN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SYNOVUS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATHARINE D HANLEY, ESQ