This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/14/2021 at 00:39:31 (UTC).

SYBIL MORGAN vs. FI THE ABBY LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2011 SYBIL MORGAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FI THE ABBY LLC,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RONDOLINO, ANTHONY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RONDOLINO, ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF SYBIL W MORGAN FORMERLY KNOWN AS MORGAN, SYBIL

MORGAN, HENRY AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ESTATE OF SYBIL MORGAN

Defendants

AIRAMID FLORIDA LLC

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

DDL HOLDINGS LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS SENIOR HEALTH MANAGEMENT CONSULTING LLC

FI THE ABBY LLC

HOWE, DEBRA

MADONNA, HARRY DILLON

SENIOR HEALTH MANAGEMENT GOLD COAST

SENIOR HEALTH MANAGEMENT GULF COAST

SENIOR HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

THEMIS HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

Not Classified By Court

MORGAN, BRAD

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/04/2013: ANSWER OF

AMENDED COMPLAINT

02/25/2013: AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING

04/25/2012: NOTICE OF FILING

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

08/17/2011: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

WITNESS LIST

04/22/2013: WITNESS LIST

REQUEST FOR COPIES

06/22/2012: REQUEST FOR COPIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/29/2011: CIVIL COVER SHEET

PLTF PET'S MOTION IN LIMINE

05/01/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION IN LIMINE

NOTICE OF FILING

05/18/2012: NOTICE OF FILING

164 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2013
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; ESTATE OF SYBIL W MORGAN; Total Financial Assessment; 37.00; Total Payments and Credits; 37.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2013-85664; TERESA LANDERS; (37.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; ESTATE OF SYBIL W MORGAN; Total Financial Assessment; 37.00; Total Payments and Credits; 37.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 37.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • DocketDISMISSED-SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Docket(NON RECORDED) STIPULATION; FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; Vol./Book 18090, Page 2200, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; RCVD BY COURT 071513

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • Docket(NON RECORDED) STIPULATION; FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketEXHIBIT; (B) CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
193 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketSummons - Fee Paid $; Comment: SUMMONS FEE PAID $110.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketAdditional Party Fee Paid $; Comment: ADDITIONAL PARTY FEE PAID - $15.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketCircuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $400.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 013 BY 3679 - RANDOM CI; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less