This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/19/2019 at 08:00:18 (UTC).

SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER LP Vs. STANLEY PARRISH

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against STANLEY PARRISH. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER LP

5310 Cypress Center Dr Ste 105

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant

PARRISH, STANLEY ALSO KNOWN AS PARRISH, STANLEY E

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL GEORGE F DAVIS

Attorney at MGFD LAW FIRM PA

2753 State Road 580 Suite 209

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/28/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

01/23/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/11/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/11/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

01/11/2019: VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

01/11/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/11/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/12/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

CERT OF MAILING - TENANT EVICTION

12/27/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/21/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/21/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

THREE DAY NOTICE

12/21/2018: THREE DAY NOTICE

LEASE

12/21/2018: LEASE

COMPLAINT

12/21/2018: COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 16; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 15; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 14; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20412, Page 2104, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 12; Party: PARRISH, STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 8; 122818; Party: PARRISH, STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 10; DEFAULT ENTERED; Party: SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 11; Party: SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: PARRISH, STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • COMPLAINT; Doc # 1; FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • LEASE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • THREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: PARRISH, STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER LP; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2018-46489; SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER LP; (195.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER LP; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less