This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 08:05:49 (UTC).

SW1 TRELLIS OWNER LLC Vs. KEVIN BYBEE

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 SW1 TRELLIS OWNER LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KEVIN BYBEE. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY, LORRAINE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CO

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY, LORRAINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SW1 TRELLIS OWNER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS TRELLIS AT THE LAKES

Po Box 62884

Fort Myers, FL 33906

Defendant

BYBEE, KEVIN

St Petersburg, FL 33716

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFERY M WILKINS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HEIST WEISSE & WOLK PA

Post Office Box 62884

Fort Meyers, FL 33906

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

03/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

03/21/2022: COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

03/21/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

LEASE

03/21/2022: LEASE

THREE DAY NOTICE

03/21/2022: THREE DAY NOTICE

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/21/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

CERT OF MAILING - CO

03/24/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED

04/05/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

04/05/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

CLERK DEFAULT ENTERED / WITH MOTION

04/05/2022: CLERK DEFAULT - ENTERED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

04/05/2022: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - POSTED; Doc # 8; 3/24/2022; Party: BYBEE, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 9; KEVIN BYBEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCLERK DEFAULT - ENTERED; Doc # 10; / WITH MOTION; Party: BYBEE, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 11; FOR POSSESSION; Party: SW1 TRELLIS OWNER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 7; Party: BYBEE, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SW1 TRELLIS OWNER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-10114; SW1 TRELLIS OWNER LLC; (195.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SW1 TRELLIS OWNER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketLEASE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 6; Party: BYBEE, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SW1 TRELLIS OWNER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILKINS JEFFERY M