Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/15/2021 at 00:35:21 (UTC).

SUSAN SANDERS Vs. TRINITY HEALTH CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2017 SUSAN SANDERS filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against TRINITY HEALTH CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NEWTON, CYNTHIA J and ALLAN, LINDA R. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

ALLAN, LINDA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDERS, SUSAN

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendants and Intervenors

FINN, JOHN, MD

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

TRINITY HEALTH CORPORATION

C/O Ct Corporation System, Ra 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

ST ANTHONYS PROFESSIONAL BUILDINGS AND SERVICES

C/O Baycare Health System, Inc. Ra 2985 Drew Street

Clearwater, FL 33759

ST ANTHONYS HOSPITAL INC

C/O Baycare Health System, Inc., Ra 2985 Drew Street

Clearwater, FL 33759

BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM INC

C/O Scott A. Kizer, Ra 2985 Drew Street

Clearwatert, FL 33759

BHATIA, VIKAS, MD

St. Petersburg, FL 33709

BAY AREA HEART CENTER PA

C/O Mohan S. Reddy, Md, Ra 5398 Park Street North

St. Petersburg, FL 33709

SRIVASTAVA, AMIT, MD

St. Petersburg, FL 33709

BAY AREA HEART CENTER INC

KOHL, DAVID, MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESLEY T STRAW

Attorney at EMERSON STRAW P L

1101 Dr Mlk Jr St North

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant and Intervenor Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER J SCHULTE

Attorney at WEEKLEY SCHULTE VALDES LLC

1635 N Tampa St Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33602

INGUNA VARSLAVANE-CALLAHAN

Attorney at CALLAHAN LAW FIRM LLC

449 Central Ave Ste 203

St Petersburg, FL 33701

DANIEL A MARTINEZ

Attorney at MARTINEZ DENBO LLC

2935 First Ave North Second Floor

St Petersburg, FL 33713

DANIEL A MARTINEZ, ESQ

INGUNA VARSLAVANE-CALLAHAN, ESQ

Attorney at CALLAHAN LAW FIRM LLC

449 Central Avenue Suite 203

St Petersburg, FL 33701

CHRISTOPHER J SCHULTE, ESQ

 

Court Documents

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

10/26/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

EXHIBIT

09/28/2018: EXHIBIT

PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL

07/02/2018: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL

RESPONSE

04/29/2018: RESPONSE

PLTF PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL

04/26/2018: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL

ORDER

03/06/2018: ORDER

OBJECTION

02/08/2018: OBJECTION

OBJECTION

11/20/2017: OBJECTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/20/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice321840113-577

03/20/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

03/19/2019: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

EXHIBIT

03/07/2019: EXHIBIT

MOTION

03/06/2019: MOTION

ORDER

02/07/2019: ORDER

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

01/31/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/24/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

01/22/2019: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/28/2018: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

293 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketMASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 305; BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM INC / ST ANTHONYS HOSPITAL INC / ST ANTHONYS PROFESSIONAL BUILDINGS AND SERVICES / TRINITY HEALTH CORPORATION; Vol./Book 21026, Page 2477, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ALLAN, LINDA R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketDCA ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED; Doc # 302; VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL; Doc # 303; FULL AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Doc # 300; APPOINTING DISCOVERY MASTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 301; PROPOSED AGREED ORDER RECEIVED BY COURT 031519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 296; FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 297; A - SUBPOENA FOR VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
289 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: TRINITY HEALTH CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: ST ANTHONYS HOSPITAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: ST ANTHONYS PROFESSIONAL BUILDINGS AND SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 7; ISSUED; Party: BAY AREA HEART CENTER PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 8; ISSUED; Party: SRIVASTAVA, AMIT, MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 9; ISSUED; Party: FINN, JOHN, MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 10; ISSUED; Party: BHATIA, VIKAS, MD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAY AREA HEART CENTER PA is a litigant

Latest cases where St. Anthony's Hospital, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Trinity Health Corp is a litigant