This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:00:43 (UTC).

SUNNY GROVE MHC LLC Vs. CARLA BROUGHTON.et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SUNNY GROVE MHC LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CARLA BROUGHTON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUNNY GROVE MHC LLC

135 W Central Blvd, Suite 730

Orlando, FL 32801

SUNNY GROVE MHC LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

135 W Central Blvd, Suite 730

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendants

ANY KNOWN AND UNKNOWN TENANTS

Clearwater, FL 33765

BROUGHTON, CARLA

Clearwater, FL 33765

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTHA D BOLTON, ESQ

Attorney at O'CONNOR & ASSOCIATES

2240 Belleair Rd Ste 115

Clearwater, FL 33764

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/16/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

01/29/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

ANSWER

12/12/2019: ANSWER

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/26/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/09/2019: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/09/2019: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/16/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/26/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT (SRS); Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 13; IN FAVOR OF PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCOPY; Doc # 14; PLTFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT W/ ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 10; W/ ATTACHED EXHIBITS; Party: SUNNY GROVE MHC LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 11; NOT ISSUED / NO FINAL JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 8; NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 9; OF EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketANSWER; Doc # 7; Party: BROUGHTON, CARLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; Doc # 5; 120719; Party: BROUGHTON, CARLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; Doc # 6; 120719; Party: ANY KNOWN AND UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SUNNY GROVE MHC LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46018; SUNNY GROVE MHC LLC; (320.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SUNNY GROVE MHC LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: BROUGHTON, CARLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: ANY KNOWN AND UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less