This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/27/2019 at 07:02:10 (UTC).

SUN VILLAGE MHC LLC Vs. RONALD CLARKE, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SUN VILLAGE MHC LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RONALD CLARKE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY, LORRAINE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY, LORRAINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN VILLAGE MHC LLC

1701 N. 20Th Street Suite B

Tampa, FL 33605

Defendants

CLARKE, RONALD

Largo, FL 33778

MOFFAT, BRIAN

Largo, FL 33778

CLARKE, RONALD ALSO KNOWN AS RAYMOND CLARK, RONALD ALLEN

Largo, FL 33778

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN C CHASE

Attorney at ATLAS LAW

3902 North Marguerite St

Tampa, FL 33603

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/12/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

EXHIBIT

12/06/2019: EXHIBIT

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/12/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/12/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/12/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/16/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

LEASE

12/06/2019: LEASE

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/10/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • HearingCASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • HearingNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 11; W/O PREJUDICE BY; Party: SUN VILLAGE MHC LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • HearingSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 8; 121019; Party: MOFFAT, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • HearingSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 9; 121019; Party: CLARKE, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • HearingCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 7; Party: CLARKE, RONALD; Party: MOFFAT, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingCOMPLAINT - II COUNTS; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingLEASE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; B 5 DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: CLARKE, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: MOFFAT, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN VILLAGE MHC LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-45918; SUN VILLAGE MHC LLC; (205.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN VILLAGE MHC LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.