This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/13/2019 at 08:01:14 (UTC).

SUN TERRACE M LLC Vs. DARCY THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 SUN TERRACE M LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DARCY THOMPSON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CO

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN TERRACE M LLC

5860 150Th Ave N #100

Clearwater, FL 33760

Defendant

THOMPSON, DARCY

Clearwater, FL 33760

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID BLUM

Attorney at DAVID BLUM P A

Po Box 7624

Seminole, FL 33775

DAVID BLUM, ESQ

Attorney at DAVID BLUM P A

Po Box 7624

Seminole, FL 33775

 

Court Documents

NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

12/03/2018: NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

ALIAS SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

11/26/2018: ALIAS SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

ANSWER OF

11/21/2018: ANSWER OF

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/26/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

LEASE

11/14/2018: LEASE

THREE DAY NOTICE

11/14/2018: THREE DAY NOTICE

COMPLAINT

11/14/2018: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

11/14/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/14/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ORDER DENYING

12/11/2018: ORDER DENYING

EMERGENCY MOTION

12/10/2018: EMERGENCY MOTION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/07/2018: WRIT OF POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/06/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/20/2018: WRIT OF POSSESSION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO STRIKE

12/03/2018: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/03/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ALIAS SUMMONS TO

11/21/2018: ALIAS SUMMONS TO

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/14/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2018
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 19; EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • ORDER DENYING; Doc # 18; DEFTS EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY EXECUTION OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • EMERGENCY MOTION; Doc # 17; TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESION/ DENIED PER JUDGE MCNARY ORDER WILL FOLLOW; Party: THOMPSON, DARCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 16; ISSUED OTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 15; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20360, Page 1301, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 11; AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Party: SUN TERRACE M LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO STRIKE; Doc # 13; ANSWER, ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 9; Party: THOMPSON, DARCY

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 1; Party: THOMPSON, DARCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • COMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • THREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • LEASE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: THOMPSON, DARCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TERRACE M LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2018-31902; SUN TERRACE M LLC; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TERRACE M LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TERRACE M LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2018-31166; JOHN TERRY; (195.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TERRACE M LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less