This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 08:12:34 (UTC).

STEVEN MURAWSKI, et al Vs. STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 STEVEN MURAWSKI, filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MURAWSKI, IZABELLA

Tampa, FL 33606

MURAWSKI, STEVEN

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street C/O Chief Financial Officer

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEAN MAKRIS, ESQ

Attorney at MAKRIS & MULLINAX P A

908 West Horatio St

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

KATHERINE V SHADWICK, ESQ

Attorney at REYNOLDS PARRINO SHADWICK PA

8950 Dr M L King Jr St N Ste 220

St Petersburg, FL 33702

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

11/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/17/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS - ISSUED

11/17/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/17/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/17/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/17/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/03/2023: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/14/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/16/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

12/28/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/03/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/03/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/03/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 11; Party:; STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 12; (WRITTEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 13; (WRITTEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 9; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADRESSES; Party:; MURAWSKI, IZABELLA; Party:; MURAWSKI, STEVEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 8; AND EMAIL DESIGNATION; Party:; STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 12132022; Party:; STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MURAWSKI, STEVEN; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-41847; MURAWSKI, STEVEN; (410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MURAWSKI, STEVEN; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party:; STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less