This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/11/2019 at 08:02:18 (UTC).

STEVEN L STERNBECK, et al Vs. DAVID R BURFORD, INDIVIDUALLY, et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2018 STEVEN L STERNBECK filed a Probate - Trust lawsuit against DAVID R BURFORD, INDIVIDUALLY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LANGLEY, SUSAN S

Clearwater, FL 33756

STERNBECK, STEVEN L

Clearwater, FL 33756

Defendants

BURFORD, DAVID R, INDIVIDUALLY

West Chester, PA 19380

BURFORD, DAVID R, TRUSTEE

BURFORD, DAVID R, TRUSTEE AS TRUSTEE FOR THE TRUST AGREEMENT OF ELISABETH B STERNBECK DATED JULY 17 1989

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANDON D BELLEW, ESQ

Attorney at JOHNSON POPE BOKOR

911 Chestnut St

Clearwater, FL 33756

Defendant Attorney

JAMES R NIESET

Attorney at JAMES R NIESET PA

6740-D Crosswinds Dr N

St Petersburg, FL 33710-5472

 

Court Documents

ACCEPTANCE

01/08/2019: ACCEPTANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/08/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION

01/08/2019: MOTION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/12/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/12/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/12/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

EXHIBIT

11/12/2018: EXHIBIT

COMPLAINT

11/12/2018: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/12/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • MOTION; Doc # 7; TO TRANSFER TO PROBATE AND GUARDIANSHIP DIVISION (JOINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 8; / DESIGNATION EMAIL; Party: BURFORD, DAVID R, INDIVIDUALLY; Party: BURFORD, DAVID R, TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE; Doc # 9; OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • COMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A SECOND AMENDMENT TO TRUST AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 4; DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: BURFORD, DAVID R, INDIVIDUALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: BURFORD, DAVID R, TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; STERNBECK, STEVEN L; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2018-41604; STERNBECK, STEVEN L; (420.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; STERNBECK, STEVEN L; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less