Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 04/07/2021 at 07:07:42 (UTC).

STEVEN J MELILLI DC PA , AS PATIENT PRISCILLA VELEZ Vs. PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 STEVEN J MELILLI DC PA , AS PATIENT PRISCILLA VELEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVEN J MELILLI DC PA AS PATIENT VELEZ, PRISCILLA

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W MICHAEL SKIRVIN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 North Federal Hwy

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - SERVED

03/24/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom327104854

03/22/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

03/17/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

COMPLAINT E-FILED

03/17/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

03/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 4; 03222021; Party: PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; STEVEN J MELILLI DC PA; Total Financial Assessment; 65.00; Total Payments and Credits; 65.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-10680; STEVEN J MELILLI DC PA; (65.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; STEVEN J MELILLI DC PA; Total Financial Assessment; 65.00; Total Payments and Credits; 65.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer W MICHAEL SKIRVIN