This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:09:35 (UTC).

STEPHEN J SPENCER Vs. SUSAN TRAFTON

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 STEPHEN J SPENCER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SUSAN TRAFTON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPENCER, STEPHEN J

Clearwater, FL 33755

Defendant

TRAFTON, SUSAN

College Station, TX 77845

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISTINE M REIGHARD, ESQ

Attorney at STAACK SIMMS & REIGHARD PLLC

900 Drew St Ste 1

Clearwater, FL 33755

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

EXHIBIT

12/06/2019: EXHIBIT

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

01/21/2020: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

EXHIBIT

12/06/2019: EXHIBIT

STIPULATION

01/17/2020: STIPULATION

EXHIBIT

12/06/2019: EXHIBIT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/06/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCOPY; Doc # 10; STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketORDER APPROVING; Doc # 11; STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Doc # 9; FOR SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 6; Party: TRAFTON, SUSAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 8; Party: TRAFTON, SUSAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SPENCER, STEPHEN J; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46061; SPENCER, STEPHEN J; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SPENCER, STEPHEN J; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A - PROMISSORY NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; B - PROMISSORY NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 5; C - NOTICE OF THE FAIR DEBT COLLECTION PRACTICES ACT

    Read MoreRead Less