This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/26/2019 at 08:05:02 (UTC).

STASIN FAMILY TRUST Vs. ELAINE UMANSKY, et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 STASIN FAMILY TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ELAINE UMANSKY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CO

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STASIN FAMILY TRUST

Olympic Realty Servics 105 East Tarpon Avenue

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Defendants

UMANSKY, ELAINE

Clearwater, FL 33761

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUMANTS

Clearwater, FL 33761

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM M WARD, ESQ

Attorney at THE WILLIAM WARD LAW GROUP PLLC

606 Rivera Dunes Way Ste 505

Palmetto, FL 34221

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

01/08/2019: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT

01/08/2019: ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/17/2018: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER

11/27/2018: SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER

AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT

11/27/2018: AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT

DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER

11/27/2018: DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/27/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/27/2018: COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/27/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/14/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/17/2018: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/17/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/17/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION

12/17/2018: MOTION

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

01/14/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/11/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER

11/27/2018: SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/27/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 23; Party: STASIN FAMILY TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT; Doc # 20; OF FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DEFAULT NOT ENTERED; Doc # 21; BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE; Doc # 18; PROPOSED COURT DEFAULT AND FJ W/ ENVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • MOTION; Doc # 12; TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 13; NOT ENTERED / ANSWER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2018
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A - 3 DAY NOTICE TO PAY WITH ATTACHED CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER; Doc # 6; MAILED TO TIME TO GO EVICTIONS; Party: UMANSKY, ELAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER; Doc # 7; MAILED TO TIME TO GO EVICTIONS; Party: ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUMANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 8; Party: UMANSKY, ELAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 9; Party: ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUMANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; STASIN FAMILY TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2018-32102; TIME TO GO EVICTIONS; (205.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; STASIN FAMILY TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less