This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/27/2020 at 08:09:04 (UTC).

STANLEY SECURITY SOLUTIONS INC Vs. CHOICE HEALTH CARE INC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 STANLEY SECURITY SOLUTIONS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHOICE HEALTH CARE INC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY, LORRAINE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CO

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY, LORRAINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANLEY SECURITY SOLUTIONS INC

5104 South Westshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

Defendants

CHOICE HEALTH CARE INC

515 Missouri Ave North

Largo, FL 33770

CHOICE HEALTH CARE INC DOING BUSINESS AS PREMIER VEIN AND VASCULAR

515 Missouri Ave North

Largo, FL 33770

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT J LINDEMAN, ESQ

Attorney at MARCADIS SINGER P A

5104 South Westshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611-9933

Defendant Attorneys

ROBERT S JONES II, ESQ

Attorney at JONES LAW GROUP

5622 Central Ave

St Petersuburg, FL 33707

HEATH C MURPHY, ESQ

Attorney at JONES LAW GROUP

41643

St Petersburg, FL 33743

VALERIE F GATLIN, ESQ

Attorney at JONES LAW GROUP

5622 Central Avenue

St Petersburg, FL 33707

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - SERVED

11/25/2020: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/14/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOCI - 10 DAY DENIAL

11/02/2020: CLERK DENIAL OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

10/28/2020: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

SUMMONS - ISSUED

10/28/2020: SUMMONS - ISSUED

COMPLAINT

10/28/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/28/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 7; AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Party: CHOICE HEALTH CARE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 6; 11/24/2020; Party: CHOICE HEALTH CARE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCLERK DENIAL OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION; Doc # 5; REQUESTED INFORMATION NOT COVERED W/O MOTN TO DETERMINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; STANLEY SECURITY SOLUTIONS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2020-34994; STANLEY SECURITY SOLUTIONS INC; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; STANLEY SECURITY SOLUTIONS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH INVOICES ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: CHOICE HEALTH CARE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stanley Security Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CHOICES HEALTH CARE, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALERIE F GATLIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURPHY , HEATH CLAYTON