This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/12/2021 at 22:39:22 (UTC).

ST, PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT vs. DEVIN COLLINS

Case Summary

On 06/23/2011 ST, PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against DEVIN COLLINS. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGRADY, J THOMAS. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGRADY, J THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT

Defendant

COLLINS, DEVIN

 

Court Documents

(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/07/2013: (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

11/07/2013: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DISMISSAL NOTICE

09/12/2013: DISMISSAL NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2013
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McGRADY, J THOMAS); CASE DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • Docket(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. RETURN TO SENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Comment: NOTICE-LACK OF PROS MLD TO PLTF/PLTF ATTY; VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO; Comment: COLLINS DEVIN (RMVD FROM MASTER ORDER); VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO; Comment: NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 080612-MLD AS TO: VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2011
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 062911; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORFEITURE; Comment: NOTICE OF FORFEITURE; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORFEITURE; Comment: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 001 FROM SECTION HSO BY 9375 - MANUAL A; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketCircuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $400.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CLAIMANT OF SEIZURE; Comment: NOTICE OF SEIZURE; VER: F; D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION HSO BY 3679 - HOLD FP; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St. Petersburg Police Department is a litigant