This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/12/2021 at 17:42:39 (UTC).

ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT vs. DAVID ALLEN PALOMINO

Case Summary

On 06/15/2011 ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against DAVID ALLEN PALOMINO. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGRADY, J THOMAS. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGRADY, J THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT

Defendant

PALOMINO, DAVID ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2011
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR17364PG2119-001; VER: F; P; Vol./Book 17364, Page 2119, 001 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 092011; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED / DAVID A PALOMINIO; VER: F; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketPUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT; Comment: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTC OF FORFEITURE; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ORDER APPOINTING ELISOR; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2011
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECVD BY COURT 061411; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 001 FROM SECTION HSO BY 8463 - MANUAL A; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORFEITURE; Comment: NOTICE OF FORFEITURE; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT PETITION FORFEITURE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT PETITION FORFEITURE; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORFEITURE; Comment: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketCircuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $400.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CLAIMANT OF SEIZURE; Comment: NOTICE OF SEIZURE; VER: F; D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION HSO BY 8898 - HOLD FP; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St. Petersburg Police Department is a litigant