This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:06:13 (UTC).

SSSS BIG BEND LLC Vs. JAB ADVENTURES INC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SSSS BIG BEND LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAB ADVENTURES INC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SSSS BIG BEND LLC

900 Drew Street Suite 1

Clearwater, FL 33755

Defendant

JAB ADVENTURES INC

11 Baymont Street, #601

Clearwater Beach, FL 33767

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISTINE M REIGHARD, ESQ

Attorney at STAACK SIMMS & REIGHARD PLLC

900 Drew St Ste 1

Clearwater, FL 33755

Defendant Attorney

STEVEN W MOORE, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF STEVEN W MOORE

8240 - 118Th Ave North Suite 300

Largo, FL 33773-5014

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/06/2020: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

01/30/2020: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 8; Party: JAB ADVENTURES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCOPY; Doc # 6; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Doc # 7; GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER --- 20 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Doc # 5; TO FILE ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; Doc # 4; 121819; Party: JAB ADVENTURES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SSSS BIG BEND LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46052; SSSS BIG BEND LLC; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SSSS BIG BEND LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: JAB ADVENTURES INC

    Read MoreRead Less