This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:08:27 (UTC).

SOUTH PINELLAS HOMES LLC Vs. NICHOLAS GROSVENOR.et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SOUTH PINELLAS HOMES LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against NICHOLAS GROSVENOR. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY, LORRAINE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY, LORRAINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTH PINELLAS HOMES LLC

447 Third Ave. N., Suite 206

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendants

DOE, JANE

Largo, FL 33778

GROSVENOR, NICHOLAS

Largo, FL 33778

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL J KORTENHAUS

447 Third Ave North Suite 206

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/19/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/17/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/16/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/16/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/09/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/09/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/26/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/12/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

12/19/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/03/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

12/09/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/19/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/12/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

12/09/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/17/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 20; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 19; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 15; Party: DOE, JANE; Party: GROSVENOR, NICHOLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 18; DEFAULT; Vol./Book 20826, Page 2451, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 16; Party: SOUTH PINELLAS HOMES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 10; 121019; Party: GROSVENOR, NICHOLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 5; Party: GROSVENOR, NICHOLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: DOE, JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 7; Party: GROSVENOR, NICHOLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 8; Party: DOE, JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 9; Party: GROSVENOR, NICHOLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SOUTH PINELLAS HOMES LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46069; SOUTH PINELLAS HOMES LLC; (320.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SOUTH PINELLAS HOMES LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 3; A DEMAND FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less