This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:02:26 (UTC).

SILVIO CALDERON Vs. TRACY AVERY, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SILVIO CALDERON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TRACY AVERY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALDERON, SILVIO

St. Petersburg, FL 33705

Defendants

AVERY, TRACY

St. Petersburg, FL 33714

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT

St. Petersburg, FL 33714

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE KIRKPATRICK EASON, ESQ

Attorney at PALMETTO LAW P A

17 Dr Mlk Jr St S Ste 200

St Petersburg, FL 33705

 

Court Documents

VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

12/19/2019: VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/15/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/11/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/19/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/19/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

EXHIBIT

12/06/2019: EXHIBIT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/11/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/26/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/09/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/24/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/24/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 16; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 15; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 14; DEFAULT; Vol./Book 20832, Page 1195, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 12; Party: AVERY, TRACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 11; OF EVICTION; Party: CALDERON, SILVIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 7; 121019; Party: AVERY, TRACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 8; 121019; Party: UNKNOWN OCCUPANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: AVERY, TRACY; Party: UNKNOWN OCCUPANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CALDERON, SILVIO; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46037; CALDERON, SILVIO; (205.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CALDERON, SILVIO; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A- THREE DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: AVERY, TRACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: UNKNOWN OCCUPANT

    Read MoreRead Less