This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/04/2022 at 20:10:16 (UTC).

SHEREE RAULERSON BARTON Vs. DMIB PROPERTIES LLC, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 SHEREE RAULERSON BARTON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DMIB PROPERTIES LLC, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARTON, SHEREE R

St. Petersburg, FL 33713

BARTON, SHEREE RAULERSON

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Defendants

DMIB PROPERTIES LLC

211 North Third Street

St Charles, MO 63301

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

1 First American Way

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARLETT M MASSEY

Attorney at MASSEY LAW GROUP PA

3833 Central Ave

St Petersburg, FL 33713

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED

10/06/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

10/06/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

10/06/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom330378588

10/08/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom330378588

10/08/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

COVID ZOOM 1ST HEARING - THURSDAY - SC PRETRIAL - DEFT

10/15/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

COVID ZOOM 1ST HEARING - THURSDAY - SC PRETRIAL - PLTF

10/15/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

COVID ZOOM 1ST HEARING - THURSDAY - SC PRETRIAL - DEFT

10/15/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS - SERVED

10/25/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/02/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE); CASE DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 6; WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 5; 10/20/2021; Party: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BARTON, SHEREE RAULERSON; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-38519; BARTON, SHEREE R; (320.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BARTON, SHEREE RAULERSON; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 4; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Massey, Starlett M