Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/14/2021 at 03:39:50 (UTC).

SHARON LEMA, et al Vs. ST LUKES SURGICAL CENTER INC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2017 SHARON LEMA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ST LUKES SURGICAL CENTER INC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CI

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEMA, SHARON AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ESTATE OF ASHEBER LEMA DECEASED

LEMA, SHARON, INDIVIDUALLY ON BEHALF OF L, J, MINOR AS GUARDIAN LEMA, ASHEBER

St Petersburg, FL 34689

LEMA, JAMEEL, INDIVIDUALLY

St Petersburg, FL 34689

Defendants

ST LUKES SURGICAL CENTER INC

43309 Us Highway 19 N

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

BRANDON RODRIGUEZ MD

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

ROXANNE ORLANDO CRNA

Clearwater, FL 33764

FRANCIS, KATHERINE, MD

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

ST LUKES CATARACT AND LASER INSTITUTE PA

43309 Us Highway 19 N

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Minor

L, J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDREW F KNOPF

Attorney at PAUL KNOPF BIGGER

8600 Fourth St N

St Petersburg, FL 33702

OLIVIA T KRONENBERG

Attorney at PAUL KNOPF BIGGER

3117 Edgewater Dr

Orlando, FL 32803

DAVID A PAUL

Attorney at PAUL KNOPF BIGGER

840 S Denning Dr Ste 200

Winter Pk, FL 32792

ANDREW F KNOPF, ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

RONALD E BUSH

Attorney at BUSH GRAZIANO RICE

100 So Ashley Dr Ste 1400

Tampa, FL 33602

JESSICA N COCHRAN

Attorney at BUSH GRAZIANO RICE

100 S Ashley Drive Ste 1400

Tampa, FL 33602

JOSEPH B JONES

Attorney at BUSH GRAZIANO RICE

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1400 P O Box 3423

Tampa, FL 33601

RUTH C OSBORNE

Attorney at MCEWAN MARTINEZ DUKES AND HALL PA

Po Box 753

Orlando, FL 32802-0753

RAFAEL E MARTINEZ

Attorney at MCEWAN MARTINEZ

753

Orlando, FL 32802

BRIAN DAVID MURRY

Attorney at PAUL KNOPF BIGGER

753

Orlando, FL 32802

CARISSA WHEELER BRUMBY

Attorney at BEYTIN MCCLAUGHLIN MCLAUGHLIN

1706 E Eleventh Ave

Tampa, FL 33605

MINDY MCLAUGHLIN, ESQ

Attorney at BEYTIN MCLAUGHLIN MCLAUGHLIN

1706 E Eleventh Ave

Tampa, FL 33605

Minor Attorney

GREGORY J HOAG

Attorney at MASTERSON HOAG SMITH PA

699 First Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Other Attorneys

CARISSA WHEELER BRUMBY, ESQ

Attorney at BEYTIN MCCLAUGHLIN MCLAUGHLIN

1706 E Eleventh Ave

Tampa, FL 33605

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/23/2018: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

04/23/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/30/2018: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

03/09/2018: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

11/06/2017: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

10/19/2017: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

10/16/2017: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

10/13/2017: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/13/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

09/13/2018: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

MOTION

09/06/2018: MOTION

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

06/08/2018: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

04/23/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

04/18/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/09/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE

10/31/2017: NOTICE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/24/2017: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/13/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

245 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 258; ATTACHED JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 259

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Doc # 260; FOR DISMISSAL BY PLTF W/ PREJUDICE AS TO ST LUKES SURGICAL CENTER INC / ST LUKES CATARACT AND LASER INSTITUTE P A / ROSANNE ORLANDO CRNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 261; W/PREJUDICE; Vol./Book 20666, Page 1113, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 256; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 257; W/PREJUDICE; Party: FRANCIS, KATHERINE, MD; Vol./Book 20491, Page 2697, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Doc # 255; FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE AS TO COUNT IV / VII OF PLTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO KATHERINE FRANCIS M D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 254; BY PLTF W/ PREJUDICE AS TO DEFT; Party: BRANDON RODRIGUEZ MD; Vol./Book 20426, Page 1054, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Doc # 253; FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO BRANDON RODRIGUEZ M D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 249; OF THE DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
243 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketREQUEST; Doc # 12; FOR PERMISSION TO ENTER ON LAND DIRECTED TO ST LUKES SURGICAL CNETER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • FinancialCLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; LEMA, SHARON, INDIVIDUALLY; Total Financial Assessment; 450.00; Total Payments and Credits; 450.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2017-30087; LEMA, SHARON; (450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • FinancialCLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; LEMA, SHARON, INDIVIDUALLY; Total Financial Assessment; 450.00; Total Payments and Credits; 450.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: ST LUKES SURGICAL CENTER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: FRANCIS, KATHERINE, MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: ST LUKES CATARACT AND LASER INSTITUTE PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: ROXANNE ORLANDO CRNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 7; ISSUED; Party: BRANDON RODRIGUEZ MD

    Read MoreRead Less