This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:01:57 (UTC).

SHARAD GIMA Vs. HARRY BENNETT

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SHARAD GIMA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HARRY BENNETT. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIMA, SHARAD

Clearwater, FL 33758

Defendant

BENNETT, HARRY

St Petersburg, FL 33714

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED

12/17/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/13/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

LEASE

12/06/2019: LEASE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF

12/06/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/19/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/03/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT

12/06/2019: AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/10/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/13/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/13/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

THREE DAY NOTICE

12/06/2019: THREE DAY NOTICE

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/06/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/23/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

COMPLAINT - 1 COUNT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT - 1 COUNT

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/19/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM - FDFM

12/20/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 18; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 16; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20827, Page 1750, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 12; COUNT I; Party: BENNETT, HARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketUNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE; Doc # 13; FINAL JUDGMENT W/ ENVELOPES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GIMA, SHARAD; Total Financial Assessment; 205.28; Total Payments and Credits; 205.28; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-20598; GIMA, SHARAD; (4.79)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GIMA, SHARAD; Total Financial Assessment; 205.28; Total Payments and Credits; 205.28; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 4.79

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 9; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GIMA, SHARAD; Total Financial Assessment; 205.28; Total Payments and Credits; 205.28; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-20178; GIMA, SHARAD; (200.49)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GIMA, SHARAD; Total Financial Assessment; 205.28; Total Payments and Credits; 205.28; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 5.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GIMA, SHARAD; Total Financial Assessment; 205.28; Total Payments and Credits; 205.28; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF; Doc # 1; FOR SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER; Party: BENNETT, HARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - 1 COUNT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLEASE; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 7; Party: BENNETT, HARRY

    Read MoreRead Less