This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/12/2021 at 09:56:02 (UTC).

SENNERT, RUTH ESTATE OF, et al vs. LTCSP-PASADENA LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2011 SENNERT, RUTH ESTATE OF filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LTCSP-PASADENA LLC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAY, JACK. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAY, JACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SENNERT RUTH ESTATE OF

STALLEY, DOUGLAS B PR

Lithia, FL 33547

Defendants

DDL HOLDINGS LLC

4730 Acorn Circle

Sarasota, FL 34233

HOWE, DEBRA

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

LONG TERM CARE INSTITUTE OF ST PETERSBURG LLC

360 Central Ave Suite 1550

St Petersburg, FL 33701

LTCSP-PASADENA LLC

360 Central Avenue Suite 1550

St Petersburg, FL 33701

MADONNA, HARRY DILLON

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

SENIOR HEALTH MANAGEMENT FLORIDA LLC

4730 Acorn Circle

Sarasota, FL 34233

SENIOR HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

4730 Acorn Circle

Sarasota, FL 34233

SUN COAST NURSING CENTERS INC

1313 North Market Street Ste 5100

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARL R WILANDER

Attorney at WILKES AND MCHUGH PA

800

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorney

JAMES MORIARTY

Attorney at SPECTOR GADON AND ROSEN LLP

360 Central Ave Ste 1550

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

08/21/2012: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

08/21/2012: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

08/06/2012: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

CERTIFICATE

06/29/2012: CERTIFICATE

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

06/11/2012: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/12/2012: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEF RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

04/12/2012: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

AFFIDAVIT

01/13/2012: AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

07/11/2011: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

DISMISSAL NOTICE

10/11/2013: DISMISSAL NOTICE

ORDER APPROVING

06/13/2012: ORDER APPROVING

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

05/11/2012: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

DEF RESP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

04/12/2012: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR COPIES

03/21/2012: REQUEST FOR COPIES

SUBPOENA FOR DEPO

03/21/2012: SUBPOENA FOR DEPO

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

02/29/2012: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

08/17/2011: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

07/11/2011: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2013
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer DAY, JACK); CASE DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketFINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Vol./Book 18224, Page 2022, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketORDER APPROVING; EXECUTION OF CONTRACT; Vol./Book 18143, Page 832, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 083112; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: NOTICE DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 082112; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2011
  • DocketAdditional Party Fee Paid $; Comment: ADDITIONAL PARTY FEE PAID - $7.50; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • DocketCircuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $400.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Comment: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; (2) VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 019 BY 1711 - RANDOM CI; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less