This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:00:39 (UTC).

SANDRA ROGERS Vs. LARRY T LIEBERMAN, DDS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SANDRA ROGERS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LARRY T LIEBERMAN, DDS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROGERS, SANDRA

Dunedin, FL 34697

Defendant

LIEBERMAN, LARRY T, DDS

Palm Harbor, FL 34684-1739

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

J BOWEN BROWN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOHN E KORF

1200 S Pine Island Road Ste 750

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

12/19/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

12/09/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

01/21/2020: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

12/09/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

01/28/2020: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS RESET NOTICE

02/04/2020: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/06/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SMALL CLAIMS RESET DEFT NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS RESET DEFT NOTICE

ORDER GRANTING

01/02/2020: ORDER GRANTING

APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED

12/06/2019: APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

12/19/2019: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); ORDER FROM COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketRESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED; Doc # 9; - REG MAIL; Party: ROGERS, SANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketRESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED; Doc # 10; - REG MAIL; Party: LIEBERMAN, LARRY T, DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Doc # 8; MOTION CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 6; W/ATTACHMENT; Party: LIEBERMAN, LARRY T, DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 7; DEFT REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 3; Party: LIEBERMAN, LARRY T, DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO SHERIFF; Doc # 5; Party: LIEBERMAN, LARRY T, DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; ROGERS, SANDRA; Total Financial Assessment; 0.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 0.00; INDIGENT; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; ROGERS, SANDRA; Total Financial Assessment; 0.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED; Doc # 1; Party: ROGERS, SANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less