This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/08/2019 at 08:02:34 (UTC).

SANDRA READ Vs. ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 SANDRA READ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CO

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

READ, SANDRA

Clearwater Beach, FL 33767

Defendants

GIDDEN, DEKELA

St Petersburg, FL 33705

ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS

St Petersburg, FL 33705

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/07/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF

12/11/2018: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF

DEFAULT ENTERED

11/26/2018: DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

11/21/2018: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/21/2018: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT

11/28/2018: ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

11/20/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

11/09/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

THREE DAY NOTICE

11/09/2018: THREE DAY NOTICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/09/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - 1 COUNT

11/09/2018: COMPLAINT - 1 COUNT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/09/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

11/09/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 16; RTND UNEXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED WITH CHECK; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 13; IN FAVOR OF PLTF AGAINST DEKELA GIDDEN; Vol./Book 20363, Page 1864, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT; Doc # 12; OF FINAL JUDGMENT - EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 10; CT1; Party: GIDDEN, DEKELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE; Doc # 11; FJ W/ ENVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 8; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 7; 111018; Party: GIDDEN, DEKELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 1; Party: GIDDEN, DEKELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 2; Party: GIDDEN, DEKELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • COMPLAINT - 1 COUNT; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • THREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; READ, SANDRA; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2018-12070; READ, SANDRA; (195.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; READ, SANDRA; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less