This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/27/2019 at 07:01:13 (UTC).

SANDRA ANN READ Vs. SAMONA HOSTEN, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SANDRA ANN READ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SAMONA HOSTEN. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

READ, SANDRA ANN

Clearwater Beach, FL 33767

Defendants

BATES, FREDDIE

St Petersburg, FL 33705

HOSTEN, SAMONA

St Petersburg, FL 33705

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/13/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

THREE DAY NOTICE

12/06/2019: THREE DAY NOTICE

DEFAULT ENTERED

12/23/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/13/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF

12/06/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LEASE

12/06/2019: LEASE

COMPLAINT - 1 COUNT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT - 1 COUNT

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DETERMINE AMT OF DEPOSIT IN

12/20/2019: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DETERMINE AMT OF DEPOSIT IN COURT REG

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/10/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/06/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/20/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/20/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

12/20/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • HearingDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 16; CT 1 (SEE NOTES TAB); Party: BATES, FREDDIE; Party: HOSTEN, SAMONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • HearingUNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE; Doc # 17; FINAL JUDGMENT W/ ENVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • HearingMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • HearingPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • HearingPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 12; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • HearingDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DETERMINE AMT OF DEPOSIT IN COURT REG; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • HearingANSWER OF; Doc # 19; Party: BATES, FREDDIE; Party: HOSTEN, SAMONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • HearingSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 8; 121119; Party: BATES, FREDDIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • HearingSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 9; 121119; Party: HOSTEN, SAMONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • HearingCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 7; Party: BATES, FREDDIE; Party: HOSTEN, SAMONA

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingTHREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingLEASE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF; Doc # 6; Party: BATES, FREDDIE; Party: HOSTEN, SAMONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; READ, SANDRA ANN; Total Financial Assessment; 219.87; Total Payments and Credits; 219.87; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-32300; READ, SANDRA ANN; (2.07)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; READ, SANDRA ANN; Total Financial Assessment; 219.87; Total Payments and Credits; 219.87; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 2.07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; READ, SANDRA ANN; Total Financial Assessment; 219.87; Total Payments and Credits; 219.87; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-31193; READ, SANDRA ANN; (217.80)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; READ, SANDRA ANN; Total Financial Assessment; 219.87; Total Payments and Credits; 219.87; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 12.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; READ, SANDRA ANN; Total Financial Assessment; 219.87; Total Payments and Credits; 219.87; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.