This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:02:06 (UTC).

SAME DAY WINDSHIELDS LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR TERESA HENSEN Vs. NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SAME DAY WINDSHIELDS LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR TERESA HENSEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAME DAY WINDSHIELDS LLC

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

SAME DAY WINDSHIELDS LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HENSEN, TERESA

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant

NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

C/O Fl Chief Financial Officer As Ra Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARC B NUSSBAUM

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM PA

2201 Fourth St N Ste G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN P O'FLANAGAN, ESQ

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P A

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602-5241

TREVOR RHODES, ESQ

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P A

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/28/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM

12/16/2019: NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/28/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

01/09/2020: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL GLASS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/06/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

JOINT STIP TO APPLY FULL FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

01/08/2020: JOINT STIP TO APPLY FULL FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/06/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/06/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS

01/24/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/06/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

01/24/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/06/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

01/06/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/06/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER

01/13/2020: ORDER

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

01/24/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 19; ATTORNEY'S FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 22; WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Doc # 16; OR SUMMARY DISPOSITION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PARTIAL SUMMARY DISPOSITION BASED UPON DEFENDANT'S VOLUNTARY PAYMENT AFTER THE LAWSUIT WAS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS; Doc # 17; AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 18; FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketORDER; Doc # 15; ON JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PENDING RE; Doc # 14; DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 7; Party: NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 9; Party: NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SAME DAY WINDSHIELDS LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 90.00; Total Payments and Credits; 90.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46036; SAME DAY WINDSHIELDS LLC; (90.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SAME DAY WINDSHIELDS LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 90.00; Total Payments and Credits; 90.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less