This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:03:54 (UTC).

SAME DAY WINDSHIELDS LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR MARGARET COLESCOTT Vs. SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SAME DAY WINDSHIELDS LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR MARGARET COLESCOTT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAME DAY WINDSHIELDS LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR COLESCOTT, MARGARET

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

C/O Fl Chief Financial Officer As Ra Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARC B NUSSBAUM

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM PA

2201 Fourth St N Ste G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorney

LAURA W JOHNSON

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF AMY L WARPINSKI

1301 Riverplace Blvd Ste 1640

Jacksonville, FL 32207

 

Court Documents

NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM

12/16/2019: NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/19/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

12/19/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/07/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/06/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/06/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/06/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/06/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

01/09/2020: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL GLASS

NOTICE

12/19/2019: NOTICE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/06/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

12/19/2019: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PENDING RE; Doc # 17; DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 16; WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 11; Party: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCLOSURE; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 14; DEFENDANT'S CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM; Doc # 10; SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS 121319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SAME DAY WINDSHIELDS LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 90.00; Total Payments and Credits; 90.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46033; SAME DAY WINDSHIELDS LLC; (90.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SAME DAY WINDSHIELDS LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 90.00; Total Payments and Credits; 90.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1; WITH EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSCHEDULE PRE-TRIAL ON SC-GLASS CASES HEARING SESSION; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 7; Party: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 9; Party: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

    Read MoreRead Less