Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/10/2021 at 20:09:07 (UTC).

SAMANTHA CURRY Vs. GLEB BEREZOVSKIY, et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 SAMANTHA CURRY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GLEB BEREZOVSKIY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CURRY, SAMANTHA

Port Richey, FL 34668

Defendants

A K BUILDERS LLC

6265 42Nd Street North

Pinellas Park, FL 33781

BEREZOVSKIY, GLEB

Tampa, FL 33609

BEREZOVSKIY, YULIYA

Tampa, FL 33609

VARGA, BALINT

St Petersburg, FL 33710

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS D ROEBIG JR, ESQ

Attorney at FLORIN ROEBIG PA

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendant Attorneys

SADIYA HASHEM, ESQ

Attorney at SHELTON | MCKEAN

9700 - 9Th St N Ste 400

St Petersburg, FL 33702

ROBERT P KELLY

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GLENN G GOMER

7217

London, KY 40742

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/26/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/26/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/26/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/26/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/26/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/26/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/18/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/18/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/10/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/26/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS - SERVED

01/20/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

ANSWER

01/15/2021: ANSWER

ANSWER

01/15/2021: ANSWER

SUMMONS - SERVED

01/14/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/05/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS - ISSUED

12/10/2020: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

12/10/2020: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

12/10/2020: SUMMONS - ISSUED

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Doc # 11; TO COMPLAINT; Party: BEREZOVSKIY, YULIYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 01122021; Party: VARGA, BALINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CURRY, SAMANTHA; Total Financial Assessment; 440.00; Total Payments and Credits; 440.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2020-40139; CURRY, SAMANTHA; (440.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CURRY, SAMANTHA; Total Financial Assessment; 440.00; Total Payments and Credits; 440.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: VARGA, BALINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party: A K BUILDERS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 5; Party: BEREZOVSKIY, YULIYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 6; Party: BEREZOVSKIY, GLEB

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roebig, Thomas D, Jr.