This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/22/2021 at 19:22:11 (UTC).

ROSE MCDONOUGH Vs. SCHEPKER ENTERPRISES L.C, et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2018 ROSE MCDONOUGH filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SCHEPKER ENTERPRISES L C,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MINKOFF, THOMAS H. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MINKOFF, THOMAS H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDONOUGH, ROSE

Defendant

SCHEPKER ENTERPRISES L.C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LINDSAY TOPPING BRIGMAN, ESQ

GERARD A TUZZIO, ESQ

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/06/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

01/04/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST FOR COPIES

08/12/2019: REQUEST FOR COPIES

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

06/18/2019: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/27/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

08/01/2019: REQUEST FOR COPIES

EXHIBIT

02/25/2019: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/18/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

06/06/2019: REQUEST FOR COPIES

278 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 293; (AGREED) W/PREJUDICE BETWEEN SCHEPKER ENTERPRISES L C AND AIRHEADS OF PINELLAS LLC; Vol./Book 20878, Page 1427, 3 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 291

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Doc # 292; OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 289; PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketFINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Doc # 290; AS TO AIRHEADS OF PINELLAS LLC/VERTICAL VENTURE HOLDINGS LLC/VERTICAL VENTURE PARTNERS INC/XTREME JUMP OF TAMPA LLC; Vol./Book 20794, Page 2124, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Doc # 288; FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketFINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Doc # 287; AS TO DEFT IKEA US RETAIL LLC ONLY; Vol./Book 20736, Page 2414, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Doc # 286; FOR FINAL DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT. IKEA US RETAIL. LLC. ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL; Doc # 285; FULL AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Doc # 283; (PARTIAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
275 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 9; ISSUED; Party: VERTICAL VENTURE HOLDINGS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 10; ISSUED; Party: VERTICAL VENTURE PARTNERS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 11; ISSUED; Party: XTREME JUMP OF TAMPA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 12; ISSUED; Party: IKEA PURCHASING SERVICES US INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 13; ISSUED; Party: SCHEPKER ENTERPRISES L.C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: AIRHEADS TRAMPOLINE ARENA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MCDONOUGH, ROSE; Total Financial Assessment; 525.00; Total Payments and Credits; 525.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2018-21288; MCDONOUGH, ROSE; (525.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MCDONOUGH, ROSE; Total Financial Assessment; 525.00; Total Payments and Credits; 525.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 525.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less