This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 06:30:56 (UTC).

RONALD MARSTON Vs. HOWARD JONES, INDIVIDUALLY, et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 RONALD MARSTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HOWARD JONES, INDIVIDUALLY,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARSTON, RONALD

St. Petersburg, FL 33703

Defendants

AIG PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY A FOREIGN FOR PROFIT CORPORATION

C/O Chief Financial Officer, Registered Agent 200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

JONES, HOWARD, INDIVIDUALLY

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IAN R LEAVENGOOD, ESQ

Attorney at LEAVENLAW NORTHEAST PROFESSIONAL CENTER

3900 First St N Ste 100

St Petersburg, FL 33703

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL E REED, ESQ

Attorney at WICKER SMITH O'HARA MCCOY & FORD, P.A.

100 South Ashley Drive Suite 1800

Tampa, FL 33602-5309

AMY RAY, ESQ

Attorney at WICKER SMITH O'HARA

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1800

Tampa, FL 33602

ATHENA THANOS, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT D TETREAULT

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 550

Tampa, FL 33602-5305

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/14/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS - ISSUED

11/14/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/14/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

EXHIBIT

11/14/2022: EXHIBIT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/14/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/14/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

11/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

11/14/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/07/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/07/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/07/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/07/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/07/2022: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

12/05/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/05/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/05/2022: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS - SERVED

11/23/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 16; Party:; JONES, HOWARD, INDIVIDUALLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 17; AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL EMAIL ADDRESS; Party:; JONES, HOWARD, INDIVIDUALLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 13; Party:; AIG PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY; Party:; JONES, HOWARD, INDIVIDUALLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 14; Party:; AIG PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY; Party:; JONES, HOWARD, INDIVIDUALLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 12; 11172022; Party:; JONES, HOWARD, INDIVIDUALLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 2; Party:; JONES, HOWARD, INDIVIDUALLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party:; AIG PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 6; A POLICY NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 7; AS TO HOWARD JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 8; AS TO HOWARD JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 9; AS TO HOWARD JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 10; AS TO AIG PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 11; AS TO AIG PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED , MICHAEL E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAY , AMY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATHENA THANOS