This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/20/2020 at 07:37:58 (UTC).

ROGER BATTISTONI Vs. J AND E CUSTOM CABINETS INC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 ROGER BATTISTONI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against J AND E CUSTOM CABINETS INC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MINKOFF, THOMAS H and RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MINKOFF, THOMAS H

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BATTISTONI, ROGER

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

J AND E CUSTOM CABINETS INC

14306 Thompson Dr.

Hudson, FL 34667

DESKINS, JOHN

Hudson, FL 34667

Not Classified By Court

MAC ENTERPRISES OF TAMPA BAY INC A FLORIDA CORPORATION

20228 County Line Rd

Lutz, FL 33558

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARRETT SEVERSON

Attorney at McINTYRE THANASIDES et al PA

500 East Kennedy Blvd Suite 200

Tampa, FL 33602

JOSHUA SCOTT SMITH, ESQ

Attorney at MCINTYRE THANASIDES BRINGGOLD

500 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33602

GARRETT s SEVERSON, ESQ

Attorney at McINTYRE THANASIDES et al PA

500 East Kennedy Blvd Suite 200

Tampa, FL 33602

PAUL B THANASIDES, ESQ

Attorney at MCINTYRE THANASIDES BRINGGOLD

500 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

J MARSHALL FRY

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

2708 Alternate 19 Suite 604-11

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

12/12/2020: NOTICE

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO STRIKE

12/12/2020: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO STRIKE

REQUEST

12/03/2020: REQUEST

NOTICE

12/03/2020: NOTICE

RESPONSE

12/03/2020: RESPONSE

RESPONSE

11/23/2020: RESPONSE

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS - ISSUED

11/02/2020: THIRD PARTY SUMMONS - ISSUED

EXHIBIT

11/02/2020: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

11/02/2020: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

11/02/2020: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

11/02/2020: EXHIBIT

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

10/09/2020: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

EXHIBIT

10/06/2020: EXHIBIT

REPLY

12/12/2020: REPLY

NOTICE

09/21/2020: NOTICE

NOTICE OF FILING

08/25/2020: NOTICE OF FILING

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/07/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

08/07/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2020
  • DocketREPLY; Doc # 28; TO SECOND, FIFTH, AND SEVENTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2020
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO STRIKE; Doc # 29; "RESPONSES" TO DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2020
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO STRIKE; Doc # 30; THIRD, FOURTH, AND SIXTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 31; OF REQUEST FOR COURT TO CONSIDER MOTION BASED ON WRITTEN SUBMISSIONS WITHOUT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 32; OF REQUEST FOR COURT TO CONSIDER MOTION BASED ON WRITTEN SUBMISSIONS WITHOUT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 24; TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' SIXTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 25; OF REQUEST FOR COURT TO CONSIDER MOTION BASED ON WRITTEN SUBMISSIONS WITHOUT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 26; TO MOTN TO STRIKE DEFT SIXTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketREQUEST; Doc # 27; FOR COURT TO CONSIDER MOTION BASED ON WRITTEN SUBMISSIONS WITHOUT HEARING (NOTICE OF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 22

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 8; COMPLAINT OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY TO STRIKE CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 5; RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 6; 081420; Party: J AND E CUSTOM CABINETS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 081420; Party: DESKINS, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BATTISTONI, ROGER; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2020-25411; BATTISTONI, ROGER; (420.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BATTISTONI, ROGER; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: J AND E CUSTOM CABINETS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: DESKINS, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEVERSON , GARRETT SCOTT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH , JOSHUA SCOTT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THANASIDES , PAUL B