This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/08/2021 at 14:24:30 (UTC).

ROBERTS, ALPHA KATE, et al vs. HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2011 ROBERTS, ALPHA KATE, filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAY, JACK. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CI

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAY, JACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBERTS, ALPHA KATE

ROBERTS, GREGORY

Defendants

AIRAMID FLORIDA LLC

AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

BICKETT, BRIAN

BLAKE, BRUCE M

DAVIS, DANIEL R

FINGER, JOHN JOSEPH ALSO KNOWN AS FINGER, JACK

HOWE, DEBRA

KANNON HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

MADONNA, HARRY DILLON

PARADIS, KRISTINE N

REID, ETHAN PAUL

SENIOR HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

SENIOR HEALTH MANAGEMENT-GULF COAST LLC

HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC DOING BUSINESS AS BOCA CIEGA CENTER DOING BUSINESS AS BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC

 

Court Documents

COPY DEPOSITION OF

01/08/2013: COPY DEPOSITION OF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/27/2011: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W O DEPO

DEF RESP'S MOTION IN LIMINE

12/05/2012: DEF-RESP'S MOTION IN LIMINE

DEF RESP'S MOTION IN LIMINE

12/05/2012: DEF-RESP'S MOTION IN LIMINE

DEFAULT ENTERED

04/11/2012: DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/01/2011: AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEF RESP'S MOTION IN LIMINE

12/05/2012: DEF-RESP'S MOTION IN LIMINE

321 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2013
  • DocketSTIPULATION; FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; Vol./Book 17958, Page 309, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; SETTLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING; 011513 1:30 (SECOND)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • DocketNOTICE; OF RELIANCE AND FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • DocketCOPY DEPOSITION OF; BRIAN BICKETT 051512 - END OF VOLUME 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • DocketCOPY DEPOSITION OF; ETHAN REID 053012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • DocketCOPY DEPOSITION OF; JACKIE PRICE 092612

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
310 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2011
  • DocketCircuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $400.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Comment: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 019 BY 4943 - RANDOM CI; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less