Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/26/2020 at 09:53:57 (UTC).

ROBERT VORNHEDER, TINA VORNHEDER Vs. GDH ENTERPRISES LLC

Case Summary

On 07/14/2015 ROBERT VORNHEDER, TINA VORNHEDER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GDH ENTERPRISES LLC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-SC

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VORNHEDER, ROBERT

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

VORNHEDER, TINA

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendant

GDH ENTERPRISES LLC

C/O Dallas Rose 600 Buckingham Ave W

Oldsmar, FL 34677

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

08/11/2015: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

08/11/2015: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

09/01/2015: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

ALIAS NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

08/19/2015: ALIAS NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

08/11/2015: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

No Description Available

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

07/15/2015: NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

07/15/2015: NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT

EXHIBIT

07/14/2015: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

07/14/2015: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

07/14/2015: EXHIBIT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/14/2015: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

No Description Available

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

09/01/2015: SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; Vol./Book 18914, Page 2085, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Party: GDH ENTERPRISES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; VORNHEDER, ROBERT; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-28526; VORNHEDER, ROBERT; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; VORNHEDER, ROBERT; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; VIA PLAINTIFF(PICKUP AT COUNTER); Party: GDH ENTERPRISES LLC; Party: VORNHEDER, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; VIA MAIL BACK TO PLTF AS REQUESTED FOR SERVICE; Party: GDH ENTERPRISES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; VORNHEDER, ROBERT; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # NC-2015-15108; VORNHEDER, ROBERT; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; VORNHEDER, ROBERT; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketEXHIBIT; STATEMENT OF EVENTS FROM PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketEXHIBIT; COPIES OF CHECKS FROM PLTF TO DEFT (3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketEXHIBIT; COPIES OF INVOICES (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GDH ENTERPRISES is a litigant