This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/15/2019 at 08:05:09 (UTC).

RIVERSIDE PARTNERS LTD Vs. BEAU GORECKI

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 RIVERSIDE PARTNERS LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BEAU GORECKI. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CO

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RIVERSIDE PARTNERS LTD

C/O John E. Mcmillan 5309 E. Busch Blvd.

Temple Terrace, FL 33617

RIVERSIDE PARTNERS LTD DOING BUSINESS AS RIVERSIDE APARTMENTS

C/O John E. Mcmillan 5309 E. Busch Blvd.

Temple Terrace, FL 33617

Defendant

GORECKI, BEAU

Temple Terrace, FL 33617

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN E MCMILLAN

Attorney at JOHN E McMILLAN PA

5309 East Busch Blvd

Temple Terrace, FL 33617

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

02/08/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

02/01/2019: VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/01/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

02/01/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

02/01/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/11/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

CERT OF MAILING - TENANT EVICTION

01/18/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

01/14/2019: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

01/14/2019: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

01/14/2019: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

01/14/2019: COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/14/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/14/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 15; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 14; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20429, Page 582, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 12; Party: GORECKI, BEAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 8; 01/24/19; Party: GORECKI, BEAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 9; 01/24/19; Party: GORECKI, BEAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 10; AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Party: RIVERSIDE PARTNERS LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 7; Party: GORECKI, BEAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 1; ISSUED; Party: GORECKI, BEAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT - II COUNTS; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 4; THREE DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 5; CONTRACT AND LEASE AMENDMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 6; LEASE CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; RIVERSIDE PARTNERS LTD; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-01780; RIVERSIDE PARTNERS LTD; (195.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; RIVERSIDE PARTNERS LTD; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less