This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/15/2019 at 08:05:59 (UTC).

RICHARD T DAVIS Vs. NICHOLAS BAKER, et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 RICHARD T DAVIS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NICHOLAS BAKER. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS, RICHARD T

Dunedin, FL 34698

Defendants

ALL TENANTS

3901 46Th Ave North Lot L-9

St Petersburg, FL 33714

BAKER, NICHOLAS

St Petersburg, FL 33714

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

01/14/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/09/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

DEFAULT ENTERED

01/07/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM - FDFM

01/14/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

01/04/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/04/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/04/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/26/2018: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/26/2018: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/17/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/17/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/17/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

12/17/2018: COMPLAINT

THREE DAY NOTICE

12/17/2018: THREE DAY NOTICE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 16; Vol./Book 20401, Page 1354, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 13; NOT ISSUED / NO FINAL JUDGMENT FILED AS OF 1/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 11; CT 1; Party: ALL TENANTS; Party: BAKER, NICHOLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE; Doc # 12; FJ W/ ENVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 6; 121918; Party: BAKER, NICHOLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2018
  • COMPLAINT; Doc # 2; FOR TENANT EVICTION - COUNT I - TO RECOVER POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: BAKER, NICHOLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; DAVIS, RICHARD T; Total Financial Assessment; 210.06; Total Payments and Credits; 210.06; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-00434; DAVIS, RICHARD T; (1.56)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; DAVIS, RICHARD T; Total Financial Assessment; 210.06; Total Payments and Credits; 210.06; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; DAVIS, RICHARD T; Total Financial Assessment; 210.06; Total Payments and Credits; 210.06; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-00432; DAVIS, RICHARD T; (3.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; DAVIS, RICHARD T; Total Financial Assessment; 210.06; Total Payments and Credits; 210.06; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; DAVIS, RICHARD T; Total Financial Assessment; 210.06; Total Payments and Credits; 210.06; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2018-45629; DAVIS, RICHARD T; (205.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; DAVIS, RICHARD T; Total Financial Assessment; 210.06; Total Payments and Credits; 210.06; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less