This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:08:59 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK Vs. SALLY C HANNAMEYER, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 REGIONS BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SALLY C HANNAMEYER. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REGIONS BANK

P.O. Box 3108

Orlando, FL 32802

REGIONS BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH AMSOUTH BANK

P.O. Box 3108

Orlando, FL 32802

Defendants

UNKNOWN SETTLORS OF SALLY C HANNAMEYER

HANNAMEYER, SALLY C

Brooksville, FL 34614

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MYRON G FINLEY

Clearwater, FL 33764

FINLEY FLETCHER AND PILCH LLP

1216 Bell Drive

Clearwater, FL 33764

FINLEY, MYRON G

Clearwater, FL 33764

HANNAMEYER , SALLY C

Brooksville, FL 34614

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

Clearwater, FL 33764

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SALLY C HANNAMEYER

Brooksville, FL 34614

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

Clearwater, FL 33764

HANNAMEYER, SALLY C AS TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF SALLY C HANNAMEYER LIVING TRUST DATED JANUARY 2 1999

Brooksville, FL 34614

UNKNOWN SETTLORS OF SALLY C HANNAMEYER LIVING TRUST DATED JANUARY 2 1999

ROSSI, MIKAYLA FORMERLY KNOWN AS UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

Clearwater, FL 33764

FINLEY, KATHLEEN FORMERLY KNOWN AS UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MYRON G FINLEY

Clearwater, FL 33764

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOMPKINS A FOSTER

Attorney at FOSTER & KLINKBEIL P A

Post Office Box 3108

Orlando, FL 32802

Defendant Attorneys

NICHOLAS J TALDONE, ESQ

Attorney at TALDONE LAW

9020 Rancho Del Rio Dr Ste 101

New Port Richey, FL 34655

KATELYN L VINSON, ESQ

808-A Oakfield Dr

Brandon, FL 33511

G DONALD GOLDEN, ESQ

808-A Oakfield Dr

Brandon, FL 33511

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE

02/03/2020: RESPONSE

MOTION TO APPOINT

01/31/2020: MOTION TO APPOINT

DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/07/2020: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/06/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/03/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

NOTICE OF ACTION

12/10/2019: NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER

12/06/2019: NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET

12/06/2019: PLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET

LIS PENDENS (R)

12/06/2019: LIS PENDENS (R)

NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER

12/06/2019: NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER

FORM A-PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE

12/06/2019: FORM A-PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 41; Party: ROSSI, MIKAYLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 42; TO MTN DISMISS OR MTN FOR COMPULSORY AMENDMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 33; TO MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR COMPULSORY AMENDMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT; Doc # 34; ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Party: REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING; Doc # 35; Party: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 36; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 37; 01132020; Party: FINLEY FLETCHER AND PILCH LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 38; 01022020; Party: HANNAMEYER, SALLY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 39; 01022020; Party: HANNAMEYER , SALLY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVED; Doc # 40; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SALLY C HANNAMEYER

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Doc # 10; DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 12; ISSUED; Party: HANNAMEYER , SALLY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 13; ISSUED; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SALLY C HANNAMEYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 14; ISSUED; Party: HANNAMEYER, SALLY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 15; ISSUED; Party: FINLEY, MYRON G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 16; ISSUED; Party: FINLEY, KATHLEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 17; ISSUED; Party: FINLEY FLETCHER AND PILCH LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 18; ISSUED; Party: ROSSI, MIKAYLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 19; ISSUED; Party: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

    Read MoreRead Less