Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 04/14/2021 at 07:11:48 (UTC).

RAYMOND WILLIAMS Vs. OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 RAYMOND WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CI

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, RAYMOND

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendants

OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

One Carrier Place

Farmington, CT 06032

WEBBER, DAVID JOHN

St Petersburg, FL 33716

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IAN STANISLAUS GOMEZ

Attorney at GBY & ASSOCIATES PLLC

2037 First Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33713

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - SERVED

04/06/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

04/07/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/26/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/26/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/26/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/26/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/26/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS - ISSUED

03/24/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

03/24/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

COMPLAINT E-FILED

03/24/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

03/24/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 11; 04062021; Party: WEBBER, DAVID JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 10; 04022021; Party: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WILLIAMS, RAYMOND; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-11873; WILLIAMS, RAYMOND; (420.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WILLIAMS, RAYMOND; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party: WEBBER, DAVID JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Otis Elevator Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IAN STANISLAUS GOMEZ