This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/29/2020 at 04:33:17 (UTC).

RANDEL JUNIOR COKER Vs. JENNIFER SUE COKER, et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2015 RANDEL JUNIOR COKER filed a Family - Minor Custody lawsuit against JENNIFER SUE COKER. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Criminal Justice Center - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PIERCE, JAMES. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-FD

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Minor Custody

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PIERCE, JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COKES, RANDEL JUNIOR

Oldsmar, FL 34677

Petitioner

COKER, RANDEL JUNIOR

Oldsmar, FL 34677

Defendant

COKES, JENNIFER SUE

Tampa, FL 33612

Respondents

COATES, TUCKER

COKER, JENNIFER SUE

Tampa, FL 33612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketRETURNED FROM POST OFFICE; COPY OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • DocketNOTICE; ARREST INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT (SRS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; TEMP CUSTODY; Vol./Book 19085, Page 886, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; 021116 2:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketREQUEST; TO HAVE ADDRESS UPDATED FOR RESP-JENNIFER COKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; 01/28/15 2:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • FinancialRESPONDENT; COKER, JENNIFER SUE; Total Financial Assessment; 1.20; Total Payments and Credits; 1.20; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-43861; COKES, JENNIFER SUE; (1.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • FinancialRESPONDENT; COKER, JENNIFER SUE; Total Financial Assessment; 1.20; Total Payments and Credits; 1.20; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketCONTESTED ANSWER; PRO SE; Party: COKER, JENNIFER SUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Party: COKER, RANDEL JUNIOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • FinancialPETITIONER; COKER, RANDEL JUNIOR; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-41433; COKES, RANDEL JUNIOR; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • FinancialPETITIONER; COKER, RANDEL JUNIOR; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketPETITION FOR; TEMP CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE; AND CONSENT FOR TEMP CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY; Party: COATES, TUCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF; Party: COKER, JENNIFER SUE

    Read MoreRead Less