This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 09/08/2020 at 08:15:56 (UTC).

PITT PARTNERSHIP INC Vs. JERRY PORTER. et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 PITT PARTNERSHIP INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JERRY PORTER. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CO

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PITT PARTNERSHIP INC

11193 Seminole Blvd

Largo, FL 33778

Defendants

PORTER, JERRY

Largo, FL 33778

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

Largo, FL 33778

PORTER, JERRY DOING BUSINESS AS JERRYS APPLIANCE SERVICE

Largo, FL 33778

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSHUA MAGIDSON, ESQ

Attorney at MACFARLANE FERGUSON & MCMULLEN P A

625 Court St #200

Clearwater, FL 33756

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT

08/07/2020: EXHIBIT

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

08/07/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

CLERK DEFAULT

08/04/2020: CLERK DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

08/18/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

CERT OF MAILING - CO

07/29/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

07/28/2020: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

07/28/2020: MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

CERT OF MAILING - CO

07/29/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED

07/23/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED

SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED

07/23/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/10/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/10/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EXHIBIT

07/10/2020: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

07/10/2020: EXHIBIT

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

07/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 16; Vol./Book 21130, Page 528, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 14; OF EVICTION (DEFAULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 15; A - DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I (EVICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCLERK DEFAULT; Doc # 13; Party: ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION; Party: PORTER, JERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 11; Party: PORTER, JERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 12; Party: ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT; Doc # 9; ENTERED; Party: PITT PARTNERSHIP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED; Doc # 10; Party: ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION; Party: PORTER, JERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - POSTED; Doc # 7; 7/14/2020; Party: PORTER, JERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - POSTED; Doc # 8; 7/14/2020; Party: ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PITT PARTNERSHIP INC; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2020-22271; PITT PARTNERSHIP INC; (420.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PITT PARTNERSHIP INC; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A COMMERICAL LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; B NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF COMMERCIAL LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: PORTER, JERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less