Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 06/07/2021 at 05:34:40 (UTC).

PINELLAS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VS. CLINTON RAYMOND CLARK

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 PINELLAS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE filed an Other lawsuit against CLINTON RAYMOND CLARK. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-IN

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PINELLAS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

Largo, FL 33778

Respondent

CLARK, CLINTON RAYMOND

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MICHAEL STEFFEN, ESQ

Attorney at MICHAEL STEFFEN P A

10750 Ulmerton Rd

Largo, FL 33778

AMY TIFFANY BAKER

Attorney at PINELLAS COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE

10750 Ulmerton Road

Largo, FL 33778-1703

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMOTION; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officers FEDERICO, PHILIP J, FEDERICO, PHILIP J); FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketFINAL RISK PROTECTION ORDER AND WAIVER OF COMPLIANCE HEARING; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER RECORDS OF REGULARLY CONDUCTED BUS; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketMOTION; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers FEDERICO, PHILIP J, FEDERICO, PHILIP J); COMPLIANCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR TEMPORARY EX PARTE RISK PROTECTION ORDER; Doc # 1; Party: CLARK, CLINTON RAYMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 2; A RPO LEO AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; B LIST OF FIREARMS AND AMMUNITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY RISK PROTECTION ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS; Doc # 4; 05/13/2021 @9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 5; @8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL STEFFEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMY TIFFANY BAKER