This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/11/2019 at 08:01:03 (UTC).

PINE RIDGE AT PALM HARBOR CONDO ASSOCIATION INC Vs. ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS, et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2018 PINE RIDGE AT PALM HARBOR CONDO ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CO

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINE RIDGE AT PALM HARBOR CONDO ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION

1964 Bayshore Blvd. Suite A

Dunedin, FL 34698

Defendants

ANY UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

LINOWSKI, CAROL S

Clearwater, FL 33759

ESTATE OF CAROL S LINOWSKI

2909 Gulf To Bay Blvd #P-106

Clearwater, FL 33759

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS

Clearwater, FL 33759

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL J GREENBERG

Attorney at CIANFRONE NIKOLOFF GRANT

1964 Bayshore Blvd Ste A

Dunedin, FL 34698

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/12/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/12/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

11/12/2018: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

11/12/2018: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

11/12/2018: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

11/12/2018: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

11/12/2018: COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

11/12/2018: LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

11/12/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/19/2018: REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/19/2018: REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT

12/19/2018: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

12/19/2018: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

12/19/2018: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

12/19/2018: EXHIBIT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

12/11/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

12/11/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

11/12/2018: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT; Doc # 21; ISSUED; Party: ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT; Doc # 13; TO FORECLOSE A LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 14; A - DECLARATION OF CONDOMINIUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 15; B - ATTY LETTER RE: NOTICE OF INTENT TO RECORD CLAIM OF LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 16; C - CLAIM OF LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 17; D - ATTY LETTER RE: DELINQUENT ASSESSMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 18; E - COPY OF CERTIFIED MAIL ENVOLOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT; Doc # 19; ISSUED; Party: ESTATE OF CAROL S LINOWSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT; Doc # 20; NOT ISSUED / NAME DOES NOT MATCH AMENDED COMPLAINT; Party: ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE; Doc # 11; Party: LINOWSKI, CAROL S

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2018
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 5; EXHIBIT B NOTICE OF INTENT TO RECORD A CLAIM OF LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 6; EXHIBIT C CLAIM OF LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 7; EXHHIBIT D DELINQUENT ASSESSMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 8; EXHIBIT E RETURN MAIL UNCLAIMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 9; ISSUED; Party: LINOWSKI, CAROL S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 10; ISSUED; Party: ANY UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; PINE RIDGE AT PALM HARBOR CONDO ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 394.00; Total Payments and Credits; 394.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2018-34406; PINE RIDGE AT PALM HARBOR CONDO ASSOCIATION INC; (20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; PINE RIDGE AT PALM HARBOR CONDO ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 394.00; Total Payments and Credits; 394.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; PINE RIDGE AT PALM HARBOR CONDO ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 394.00; Total Payments and Credits; 394.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2018-41573; PINE RIDGE AT PALM HARBOR CONDO ASSOCIATION INC; (374.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; PINE RIDGE AT PALM HARBOR CONDO ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 394.00; Total Payments and Credits; 394.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 374.00

    Read MoreRead Less